Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6518.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/29/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 24).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5967.) Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
July 14 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
July 7 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1202.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1154.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 793.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|