LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB465
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB465
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB465
Compare Versions
SB465 Chaptered September 15, 2016
SB465 Enrolled September 7, 2016
SB465 Amended August 29, 2016
SB465 Amended August 19, 2016
SB465 Amended August 15, 2016
SB465 Amended August 1, 2016
SB465 Amended June 23, 2016
SB465 Amended June 8, 2016
SB465 Amended July 8, 2015
SB465 Amended July 1, 2015
SB465 Amended April 21, 2015
SB465 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB465 Chaptered September 15, 2016
SB465 Enrolled September 7, 2016
SB465 Amended August 29, 2016
SB465 Amended August 19, 2016
SB465 Amended August 15, 2016
SB465 Amended August 1, 2016
SB465 Amended June 23, 2016
SB465 Amended June 8, 2016
SB465 Amended July 8, 2015
SB465 Amended July 1, 2015
SB465 Amended April 21, 2015
SB465 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare