California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB466 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 8, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2015

Amended

Bill September 1, 2015
Bill August 18, 2015
Bill June 18, 2015
Bill April 30, 2015
Bill April 23, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015