LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB466
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB466
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB466
Compare Versions
SB466 Chaptered October 4, 2015
SB466 Enrolled September 8, 2015
SB466 Amended September 1, 2015
SB466 Amended August 18, 2015
SB466 Amended June 18, 2015
SB466 Amended April 30, 2015
SB466 Amended April 23, 2015
SB466 Amended April 20, 2015
SB466 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB466 Chaptered October 4, 2015
SB466 Enrolled September 8, 2015
SB466 Amended September 1, 2015
SB466 Amended August 18, 2015
SB466 Amended June 18, 2015
SB466 Amended April 30, 2015
SB466 Amended April 23, 2015
SB466 Amended April 20, 2015
SB466 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare