California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB470 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 27, 2015

Chaptered

Bill August 10, 2015

Amended

Bill July 9, 2015
Bill May 28, 2015
Bill April 22, 2015