LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB470
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB470
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB470
Compare Versions
SB470 Chaptered August 10, 2015
SB470 Enrolled July 27, 2015
SB470 Amended July 9, 2015
SB470 Amended May 28, 2015
SB470 Amended April 22, 2015
SB470 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB470 Chaptered August 10, 2015
SB470 Enrolled July 27, 2015
SB470 Amended July 9, 2015
SB470 Amended May 28, 2015
SB470 Amended April 22, 2015
SB470 Introduced February 25, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare