|
09/28/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 354, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2377.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2638.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 7).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1072.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 921.) (May 5). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|