LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB474
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB474
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB474
Compare Versions
SB474 Chaptered September 28, 2015
SB474 Enrolled September 1, 2015
SB474 Amended July 9, 2015
SB474 Amended April 6, 2015
SB474 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB474 Chaptered September 28, 2015
SB474 Enrolled September 1, 2015
SB474 Amended July 9, 2015
SB474 Amended April 6, 2015
SB474 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare