|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 708, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 5533.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6235.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5950.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/20/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/06/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/19/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & P. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 19). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/07/2016
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1116.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1033.) (May 18).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 794.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
April 20 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|