California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB482 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 21, 2016
Bill June 6, 2016
Bill April 7, 2016
Bill April 30, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015