|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 678, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2370.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2682.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
July 1 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1018.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 920.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|