California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB485 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2015

Amended

Bill August 27, 2015
Bill August 20, 2015
Bill July 7, 2015
Bill June 23, 2015