|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
07/25/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/13/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/27/2016
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 70. Noes 4. Page 5514.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/12/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (May 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (August 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/09/2015
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1873.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2015
|
Set for hearing July 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1451.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Set for hearing June 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/22/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/19/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|