California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB49 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 19, 2014

Enrolled

Bill June 29, 2016

Amended

Bill June 23, 2015
Bill May 20, 2015
Bill April 8, 2015