|
11/30/2016
|
Died at Desk.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2015
|
Returned by the Governor at the request of the Senate. Held at desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2141.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 5. Page 2469.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 1.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/24/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 2.) (June 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 29. Noes 7. Page 1066.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 861.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
April 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|