California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB492 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 25, 2015

Amended

Bill June 25, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015