|
10/04/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 491, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2272.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2628.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed, and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2015
|
Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 2433.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
June 22 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1118.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 825.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|