California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB516 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2015

Amended

Bill August 24, 2015
Bill July 1, 2015
Bill May 22, 2015
Bill May 6, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015