|
09/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 864, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 5479.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 5457.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5448.) Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 6234.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 20. Page 5984.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/02/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 1191.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1155.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 817.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|