California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB524 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 4, 2016
Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 8, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015