California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB526 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2016

Amended

Bill January 13, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016
Bill May 18, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015