LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB526
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB526
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB526
Compare Versions
SB526 Enrolled August 19, 2016
SB526 Amended January 13, 2016
SB526 Amended January 4, 2016
SB526 Amended May 18, 2015
SB526 Amended April 14, 2015
SB526 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB526 Enrolled August 19, 2016
SB526 Amended January 13, 2016
SB526 Amended January 4, 2016
SB526 Amended May 18, 2015
SB526 Amended April 14, 2015
SB526 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare