|
10/04/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 496, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2668.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2949.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (July 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
June 22 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 1022.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 826.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
April 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
April 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
April 7 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U., & C. and T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|