LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB530
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB530
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB530
Compare Versions
SB530 Chaptered October 4, 2015
SB530 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB530 Amended September 3, 2015
SB530 Amended August 31, 2015
SB530 Amended July 9, 2015
SB530 Amended June 25, 2015
SB530 Amended June 15, 2015
SB530 Amended April 22, 2015
SB530 Amended April 7, 2015
SB530 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB530 Chaptered October 4, 2015
SB530 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB530 Amended September 3, 2015
SB530 Amended August 31, 2015
SB530 Amended July 9, 2015
SB530 Amended June 25, 2015
SB530 Amended June 15, 2015
SB530 Amended April 22, 2015
SB530 Amended April 7, 2015
SB530 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare