|
09/28/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 355, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2371.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2696.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on A. & A.R. and V.A.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1204.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1156.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 796.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 596.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on V.A. and G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|