California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB536 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2015

Amended

Bill July 8, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015