California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB541 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2015

Amended

Bill September 3, 2015
Bill August 31, 2015
Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 16, 2015
Bill June 2, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015