LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB541
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB541
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB541
Compare Versions
SB541 Chaptered October 9, 2015
SB541 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB541 Amended September 3, 2015
SB541 Amended August 31, 2015
SB541 Amended August 17, 2015
SB541 Amended July 16, 2015
SB541 Amended June 2, 2015
SB541 Amended May 5, 2015
SB541 Amended April 6, 2015
SB541 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB541 Chaptered October 9, 2015
SB541 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB541 Amended September 3, 2015
SB541 Amended August 31, 2015
SB541 Amended August 17, 2015
SB541 Amended July 16, 2015
SB541 Amended June 2, 2015
SB541 Amended May 5, 2015
SB541 Amended April 6, 2015
SB541 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare