California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB543 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 8, 2016
Bill September 11, 2015
Bill June 18, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015