LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB543
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB543
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB543
Compare Versions
SB543 Chaptered September 21, 2016
SB543 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB543 Amended August 1, 2016
SB543 Amended June 8, 2016
SB543 Amended September 11, 2015
SB543 Amended June 18, 2015
SB543 Amended May 5, 2015
SB543 Amended April 15, 2015
SB543 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB543 Chaptered September 21, 2016
SB543 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB543 Amended August 1, 2016
SB543 Amended June 8, 2016
SB543 Amended September 11, 2015
SB543 Amended June 18, 2015
SB543 Amended May 5, 2015
SB543 Amended April 15, 2015
SB543 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare