|
10/11/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 801, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2753.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 27. Page 3104.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 8.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 16. Page 1304.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1156.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 758.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
April 15 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/25/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
April 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|