LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB546
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB546
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB546
Compare Versions
SB546 Chaptered October 11, 2015
SB546 Enrolled September 15, 2015
SB546 Amended August 31, 2015
SB546 Amended June 2, 2015
SB546 Amended April 30, 2015
SB546 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB546 Chaptered October 11, 2015
SB546 Enrolled September 15, 2015
SB546 Amended August 31, 2015
SB546 Amended June 2, 2015
SB546 Amended April 30, 2015
SB546 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare