|
04/25/2016
|
Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/17/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 14. Page 2784.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 2786.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly Rule 63 suspended. From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (September 11). Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 26. Page 3189.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/11/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (September 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. (Corrected September 10). Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 1307.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1156.) (May 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 820.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 7. Noes 2. Page 723.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & I.R. and RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|