California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB548 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 16, 2015

Amended

Bill September 11, 2015
Bill September 4, 2015
Bill August 17, 2015
Bill June 1, 2015
Bill April 14, 2015