LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB575
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB575
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB575
Compare Versions
SB575 Chaptered October 6, 2015
SB575 Enrolled September 1, 2015
SB575 Amended July 13, 2015
SB575 Amended June 29, 2015
SB575 Amended June 16, 2015
SB575 Amended April 30, 2015
SB575 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB575 Chaptered October 6, 2015
SB575 Enrolled September 1, 2015
SB575 Amended July 13, 2015
SB575 Amended June 29, 2015
SB575 Amended June 16, 2015
SB575 Amended April 30, 2015
SB575 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare