California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB579 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 3, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2015

Amended

Bill July 16, 2015
Bill June 2, 2015
Bill April 15, 2015