LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB579
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB579
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB579
Compare Versions
SB579 Chaptered October 11, 2015
SB579 Enrolled September 3, 2015
SB579 Amended July 16, 2015
SB579 Amended June 2, 2015
SB579 Amended April 15, 2015
SB579 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB579 Chaptered October 11, 2015
SB579 Enrolled September 3, 2015
SB579 Amended July 16, 2015
SB579 Amended June 2, 2015
SB579 Amended April 15, 2015
SB579 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare