Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
11/30/2016
|
From committee without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/10/2016
|
August 10 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (August 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 23). Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2945.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2016
|
Set for hearing January 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2879.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2016
|
Set for hearing January 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
May 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|