LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB587
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB587
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB587
Compare Versions
SB587 Amended August 4, 2016
SB587 Amended June 22, 2016
SB587 Amended January 4, 2016
SB587 Amended April 9, 2015
SB587 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB587 Amended August 4, 2016
SB587 Amended June 22, 2016
SB587 Amended January 4, 2016
SB587 Amended April 9, 2015
SB587 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare