|
10/11/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 803, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 2709.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 58. Noes 18. Page 2964.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Assembly Rule 69 suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/02/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. (Corrected September 2).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 26. Noes 13. Page 1206.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1157.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 820.) (April 29).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & I.R. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 819.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29 in L. & I.R. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|