California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB588 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill September 1, 2015
Bill July 1, 2015
Bill April 30, 2015
Bill April 20, 2015