|
10/10/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 736, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 2272.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 11. Page 2626.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on E. & R. and JUD.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 1061.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 819.) (April 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 723.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
April 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|