California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB589 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 10, 2015

Amended

Bill August 20, 2015
Bill June 18, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015