California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB594 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill July 7, 2015

Chaptered

Bill July 16, 2015

Amended

Bill June 11, 2015
Bill May 13, 2015
Bill April 27, 2015
Bill April 13, 2015