LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB594
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB594
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB594
Compare Versions
SB594 Chaptered July 16, 2015
SB594 Enrolled July 7, 2015
SB594 Amended June 11, 2015
SB594 Amended May 13, 2015
SB594 Amended April 27, 2015
SB594 Amended April 13, 2015
SB594 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB594 Chaptered July 16, 2015
SB594 Enrolled July 7, 2015
SB594 Amended June 11, 2015
SB594 Amended May 13, 2015
SB594 Amended April 27, 2015
SB594 Amended April 13, 2015
SB594 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare