|
09/30/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 886, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 5372.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6097.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5966.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 21).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/14/2016
|
June 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 1. Page 2961.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2934.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2016
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 594.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|