California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB6 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2014

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 30, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 27, 2016