|
04/25/2016
|
Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/10/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2759.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/10/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3092.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1207.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1157.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 758.) (April 22).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|