LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB610
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB610
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB610
Compare Versions
SB610 Enrolled September 15, 2015
SB610 Amended September 4, 2015
SB610 Amended July 14, 2015
SB610 Amended April 28, 2015
SB610 Amended April 6, 2015
SB610 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB610 Enrolled September 15, 2015
SB610 Amended September 4, 2015
SB610 Amended July 14, 2015
SB610 Amended April 28, 2015
SB610 Amended April 6, 2015
SB610 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare