|
09/23/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 534, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5532.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 5501.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2016
|
Set for hearing August 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5448.) Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6275.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 23).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Cooper.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/03/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2015
|
August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1191.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1157.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 651.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|